CT SB00011 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning An Affected Business Entity Tax, Various Provisions Related To Certain Business Deductions, The Estate And Gift Tax Imposition Thresholds, The Tax Treatment Of Certain Wages And Income And A Study To Identify Best Practices For Marketing The Benefits Of Qualified Opportunity Zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 290 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 290 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-17 | House | Public Act 18-49 |
2018-05-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | House | House Calendar Number 590 |
2018-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-08 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5867 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | File Number 624 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 385 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |