CT SB00015 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require health insurance coverage for motorized wheelchairs, including, but not limited to, used motorized wheelchairs, repairs to motorized wheelchairs and replacement batteries for motorized wheelchairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Motorized Wheelchairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-15SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-08SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 304
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 159
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-03-07SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-01SenatePublic Hearing 02/07
2019-01-24SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-11SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback