CT SB00017 | 2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require listings of covered entities be updated at least every ninety days, to prohibit covered entities from granting subsequent access to third parties to health care services, discounted rates or fees established in contracts between health care providers and contracting entities, and to specify that violations are deemed unfair or deceptive insurance practices under section 38a-816 of the general statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Health Care Provider Rental Network Contract Arrangements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 160 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-18 Signed by the Governor
2010-05-17 Transmitted to the Secretary of State
2010-05-12 Public Act 10-59
2010-05-03 In Concurrence
2010-05-03 House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2010-05-03 House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2010-04-22 House Calendar Number 377
2010-04-22 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2010-04-21 On Consent Calendar
2010-04-21 Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2010-04-21 Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 2448
2010-04-14 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2010-04-14 No New File by Committee on Public Health
2010-04-14 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-04-14 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-04-14 Joint Favorable
2010-04-08 Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
2010-03-11 File Number 20
2010-03-11 Senate Calendar Number 50
2010-03-11 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2010-03-11 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-05 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/10/10 5:00 PM
2010-02-24 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-02-23 Joint Favorable Substitute
2010-02-11 Public Hearing 02/18
2010-02-03 Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback