CT SB00017 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Implementing The Governor's Budget Recommendations For Human Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-03SenateSenate Recommitted to Human Services
2016-04-13SenateMoved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
2016-04-04SenateFile Number 426
2016-04-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 303
2016-04-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2016-04-04SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM
2016-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-17SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2016-02-10SenatePublic Hearing 02/18
2016-02-04SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback