CT SB00017 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - File Number 365
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To allow students to have equal access to institutional financial aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Assisting Students Without Legal Immigration Status With The Cost Of College.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-03SenateFile Number 365
2017-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 194
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM
2017-03-17SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-15SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-02-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2017-02-21SenateDrafted by Committee
2017-02-10SenateVote to Draft
2017-02-03SenatePublic Hearing 02/07
2017-01-19SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2017-01-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback