CT SB00017 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Procedures Related To Collecting And Processing Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 277 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 242 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2018-05-23HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-23HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-22HousePublic Act 18-83
2018-05-09HouseIn Concurrence
2018-05-09HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-07HouseHouse Calendar Number 558
2018-05-07HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-05-07HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2018-05-07SenateOn Consent Calendar
2018-05-07SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-07SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5329
2018-04-05SenateFile Number 267
2018-04-05SenateSenate Calendar Number 175
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-05SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-29SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-19SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-16SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-02-23SenatePublic Hearing 02/27
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback