CT SB00017 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 507
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize sports wagering, Internet gaming and Internet keno under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Authorizing Sports Wagering, Internet Gaming And Internet Keno.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 507
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 258
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-03-13SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/26
2019-02-07SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-11SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback