CT SB00020 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 572
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit the importation and trade of big six African species.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting The Import, Sale And Possession Of African Elephants, Lions, Leopards, Black Rhinoceros, White Rhinoceros And Giraffes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 130 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateHouse Calendar Number 572
2019-05-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-10SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-10SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8459
2019-04-23SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-23SenateNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-23SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-12SenateFile Number 43
2019-03-12SenateSenate Calendar Number 44
2019-03-12SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-12SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-26SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-25SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-02-06SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-18SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback