CT SB00036 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit health carriers from requiring the use of step therapy for drugs prescribed to treat disabling, chronic or life-threatening diseases or conditions.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Health Carriers From Requiring The Use Of Step Therapy For Drugs Prescribed To Treat Disabling, Chronic Or Life-threatening Diseases Or Conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |