CT SB00058 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit the use of gay and transgender panic as a criminal defense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Gay And Transgender Panic Defense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 287 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 124 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-12SenatePublic Act 19-27
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed
2019-05-13SenateHouse Calendar Number 559
2019-05-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-09SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-29SenateFile Number 829
2019-04-29SenateSenate Calendar Number 430
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-29SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-25SenatePublic Hearing 03/29
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-23SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback