CT SB00064 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit an employer from coercing employees into attending or participating in meetings sponsored by the employer concerning the employer's views on political or religious matters.
Title
An Act Concerning Captive Audience Meetings.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Sen. Julie Kushner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees |
2019-04-03 | Senate | File Number 360 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 201 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |