CT SB00072 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To provide a tax credit to employers that make certain education loan payments for employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Tax Credit For Employers That Make Payments On Certain Loans Issued To Employees By The Connecticut Higher Education Supplemental Loan Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 336 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 238 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 9827 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 239 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 9834 (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 240 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A & B (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-19SenatePublic Act 19-86
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateHouse Calendar Number 672
2019-05-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-28SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-05-28SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 9834
2019-05-28SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 9827
2019-05-28SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8999
2019-05-14SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14SenateNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-14SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-09SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-09SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8228
2019-04-01SenateFile Number 256
2019-04-01SenateSenate Calendar Number 139
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-01SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-11SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Banking
2019-03-09SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-14SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-01SenatePublic Hearing 02/07
2019-01-29SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00072&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00072-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00072-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00072-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00072-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00086-R00SB-00072-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00072-R00BA-CV41-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00072-R00FIN-CV141-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00240-R00SB00072-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00239-R00SB00072-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00238-R00SB00072-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00336-R00SB00072-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback