CT SB00076 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Public Hearing 03/18
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To enable municipalities to prohibit the application of pesticides on certain properties within such municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Authorizing Municipalities To Restrict The Use Of Pesticides In Certain Areas Of The Municipality Or On Certain Types Of Properties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenatePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-12SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-03-11SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-11SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback