CT SB00094 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - File Number 54
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To reduce the costs of and expand access to the administration of the influenza vaccine for minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Allowing Pharmacists To Administer The Influenza Vaccine To Children Twelve Years Of Age And Older.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateFile Number 54
2019-03-13SenateSenate Calendar Number 49
2019-03-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-13SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-05SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-20SenatePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-02-14SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-06SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback