CT SB00109 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Housing to adopt regulations concerning a limited time period for which a landlord may consider the criminal record of a prospective tenant.
Title
An Act Concerning A Landlord's Ability To Consider The Criminal Record Of Prospective Tenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |