CT SB00124 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a citizens in need account to receive charitable contributions to assist residents of this state who have had their benefits from state social services programs administered by the Department of Social Services reduced due to state budgetary constraints, and to provide a state tax deduction at the rate of two hundred per cent of the amount contributed to said account.
Title
An Act Establishing A Citizens In Need Account And A Tax Deduction For Contributions To Said Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 12 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Motion Failed (JF) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |