CT SB00134 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To enable small businesses and small business employees to participate in the state employee health plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Public Options For Health Care In Connecticut.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-03SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-03SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-24SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateFile Number 361
2019-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 192
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-02-27SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-24SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback