CT SB00138 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To revise state statutes governing the formation of cooperative associations in order to enhance the use of such associations as a business model in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Modernizing The State's Cooperative Association Statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 350 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 195 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-14SenatePublic Act 19-65
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed
2019-05-22SenateHouse Calendar Number 641
2019-05-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-21SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-21SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-30SenateFile Number 854
2019-04-30SenateSenate Calendar Number 450
2019-04-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-30SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-12SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-29SenatePublic Hearing 04/03
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-15SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback