CT SB00140 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To provide property tax relief for certain owners of real property held in trust for such owner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Expanding Eligibility For Tax Relief For Certain Elderly Homeowners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 387 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 126 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-14SenatePublic Act 19-66
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed
2019-05-13SenateHouse Calendar Number 560
2019-05-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-09SenateSenate Passed
2019-05-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-01SenateNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-01SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-24SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-10SenateFile Number 587
2019-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 290
2019-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-26SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
2019-03-22SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-20SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/13
2019-01-30SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00140&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00140-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00140-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00140-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00140-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00066-R00SB-00140-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00140-R00PD-CV12-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00140-R00PD-CV96-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00140-R00PD-CV151-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00140-R00FIN-CV114-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00126-R00SB00140-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00387-R00SB00140-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback