CT SB00152 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - Bill Passed Temporary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - Bill Passed Temporary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To repeal several obsolete reporting requirements and advisory boards and commissions and make various technical modifications to the general statutes regarding the Department of Children and Families.
Title
An Act Concerning Changes To The General Statutes Concerning The Department Of Children And Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 128 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Bill Passed Temporary | |
2010-05-04 | House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 5458 | |
2010-04-22 | House Calendar Number 395 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-01 | File Number 240 | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Calendar Number 180 | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-12 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |
2010-03-12 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2010-03-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-09 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |