CT SB00152 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a state umbilical cord blood collection program that shall be administered by the Connecticut Umbilical Cord Blood Collection Board.
Title
An Act Concerning The Establishment Of The Connecticut Umbilical Cord Blood Collection Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 335 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 156 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 156 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-160 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-19 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-05-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-19 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-17 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-05-12 | House Calendar Number 488 | |
2011-05-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-11 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Passed | |
2011-04-14 | File Number 529 | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Calendar Number 318 | |
2011-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-08 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-31 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-30 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-07 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | |
2011-02-08 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |