CT SB00152 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide prospective owners of multifamily residential properties with conspicuous notice of federal and state fair housing laws.
Title
An Act Concerning The Disclosure Of Housing Discrimination And Fair Housing Laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 130 AS AMENDED (Y: 130 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 127 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 126 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4249 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 131 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 130 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4249 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 127 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 126 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4249 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 131 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 130 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4249 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Public Act 16-16 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-04-26 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-26 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 432 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4249 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4248 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-07 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-24 | Senate | File Number 202 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 173 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |