CT SB00154 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To revise statutory provisions concerning probate court operations.
Title
An Act Concerning Probate Court Operations.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Rep. David Scribner [R] | Rep. Cecilia Buck-Taylor [R] |
Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 291 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 164 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 164 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 14-103 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 452 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-16 | Senate | File Number 563 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 391 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |