CT SB00164 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To expand workers' compensation coverage in certain situations that result in mental or emotional impairment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Workers' Compensation Benefits For Certain Mental Or Emotional Impairments, Mental Health Care For Police Officers And Wellness Training For Police Officers, Parole Officers And Firefighters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - House Roll Call Vote 257 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 251 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B,D (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-06HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-06HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-05HousePublic Act 19-17
2019-05-31HouseIn Concurrence
2019-05-31HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,D
2019-05-31HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D
2019-05-31HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
2019-05-31HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-31HouseRules Suspended
2019-05-30HouseHouse Calendar Number 683
2019-05-30HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-30HouseRules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
2019-05-30SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,D
2019-05-30SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D 10183
2019-05-30SenateAmendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule C 10047
2019-05-29SenateMatter Pass Retained
2019-05-29SenateDesignated Only Senate Amendment Schedule C 10047
2019-05-29SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 9712
2019-05-15SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-15SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-09SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-09SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8127
2019-04-03SenateFile Number 362
2019-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 202
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/26
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-02-20SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-29SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00164&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00164-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00164-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00164-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00164-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00017-R00SB-00164-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00164-R00LAB-CV7-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00164-R00LAB-CV121-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00164-R00APP-CV59-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00251-R00SB00164-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00257-R00SB00164-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback