CT SB00178 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To decrease the membership of the Commission on Equity and Opportunity from sixty-three to thirty-nine members.
Title
An Act Decreasing The Membership Of The Commission On Equity And Opportunity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 78 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 80 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 78 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 80 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Public Act 18-65 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Passed |
2018-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 408 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | File Number 31 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 61 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |