CT SB00183 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Education.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Department Of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 223 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 223 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Public Act 18-51 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 532 |
2018-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5316 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-24 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 269 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 178 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |