CT SB00187 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Housing to conduct a study of methods to increase options for apprentices and other newly hired employees to reside in the municipality where they are employed.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Apprentice And Other Workforce Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |