CT SB00188 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a pilot program to provide rental assistance certificates to assist families who have children with persistent asthma to move to healthier environments.
Title
An Act Establishing The Healthy Housing Assistance Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |