CT SB00192 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 363
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to submit a plan regarding the reopening of the state's visitor welcome centers using volunteer staffing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Reopening Of Connecticut's Visitor Welcome Centers Using Volunteer Staffing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateFile Number 363
2019-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 178
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-19SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-18SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce
2019-03-15SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback