CT SB00215 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-11-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-11-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify that eligibility for the waiver of tuition at state universities and colleges is limited to veterans who have served time additional to that spent in training and in attendance at military service academies.
Title
An Act Concerning Veteran Tuition Waivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 169 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-12 | Public Act 10-66 | |
2010-05-03 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-03 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-03 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-22 | House Calendar Number 403 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3239 | |
2010-03-29 | File Number 164 | |
2010-03-29 | Senate Calendar Number 127 | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-12 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-05 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |
2010-03-05 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |
2010-03-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-02 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans Affairs |