CT SB00215 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-06 - Public Hearing 02/13
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-06 - Public Hearing 02/13
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for notification, a public hearing and certain fiscal transparency prior to the establishment of new state parks.
Title
An Act Concerning The Establishment Of New State Parks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |