CT SB00215 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - File Number 130
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - File Number 130
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand the Labor Department's oversight of apprenticeship programs and to implement various federal models of apprenticeship in order to provide more opportunities for individuals to satisfy apprenticeship requirements, as recommended by the Program Review and Investigations Committee.
Title
An Act Concerning Apprenticeship Expansion Based On A Program Review And Investigations Committee Study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | File Number 130 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 147 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |