CT SB00219 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow private service providers to adjust their budget expenditures without approval when a state agency reduces the providers' funding.
Title
An Act Concerning State Contract Reductions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-12 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-29 | File Number 165 | |
2010-03-29 | Senate Calendar Number 123 | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-12 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-05 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |