CT SB00219 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To: (1) Provide a Probate Court with the ability to transfer a file when another Probate Court has jurisdiction over the file, (2) eliminate the requirement that the Probate Court provide notice of certain proceedings to the Commissioner of Revenue Services, (3) require a hearing for a person under voluntary representation who is without an attorney before a change of residence for such person occurs, (4) set forth additional activities that require a filing fee, (5) clarify who may be granted rights of visitation with a minor, (6) expand jurisdictional venue in certain Probate Court proceedings involving removal of guardian or termination of parental rights, and (7) expand the types of entities that may be appointed as a conservator.
Title
An Act Concerning Probate Court Operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 116 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 120 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 124 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 120 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 124 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Public Act 16-7 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-04-25 | Senate | House Passed |
2016-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 438 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | File Number 370 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 273 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |