CT SB00229 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 561
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 561
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To end the use of styrofoam trays in Connecticut schools.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Styrofoam Trays In Connecticut Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 115 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN C (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 561 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,C |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 8402 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule B 8391 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8392 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | File Number 563 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 275 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |