CT SB00234 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - House Calendar Number 407
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - House Calendar Number 407
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide consumers with full disclosure of the current financial status of the nursing home facility or managed residential community so that consumers can make an informed decision about admission.
Title
An Act Concerning Notification Of Financial Stability Of Nursing Home Facilities And Managed Residential Communities To Patients And Residents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 134 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | House Calendar Number 407 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3398 | |
2010-04-08 | File Number 389 | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Calendar Number 270 | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2010-03-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Health | |
2010-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |