CT SB00234 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for the purchase of assistance dogs.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For The Purchase Of Assistance Dogs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-10 | Senate | File Number 44 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 90 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |