CT SB00234 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 212
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To facilitate the reuse of home-generated food waste and anaerobic food digesters in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Pilot Program For Curbside Food Waste Collection Used In Anaerobic Digesters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 212
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 116
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-02-06SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-25SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback