CT SB00359 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To extend whistleblower protections to employees of businesses who receive economic development financial assistance from the state.
Title
An Act Extending Whistleblower Protections To Employees Of Businesses Receiving Financial Assistance From The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Public Act 19-69 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House Calendar Number 607 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 511 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 250 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |