CT SB00360 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Labor Department to process applications for the Work Opportunity Tax Credit and issue the tax credit certifications in a timely manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Processing Of Work Opportunity Tax Credit Applications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateFile Number 441
2019-04-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 219
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-03-12SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-03-05SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback