CT SB00372 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide additional resources to those providing care to adult children with intellectual disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Provision Of Resources To Guardians Of Adult Children With Intellectual Disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-15SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-10SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-09SenateRemoved from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24SenateMoved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-15SenateFile Number 657
2019-04-15SenateSenate Calendar Number 316
2019-04-15SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-02SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-03-19SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-03-01SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-20SenatePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-08SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback