CT SB00375 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To ensure adequate reporting of the numbers of nursing home staff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Nursing Home Staffing Levels.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 362 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 153 PASS SENATE AMD B LCO 7763 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 154 PASS SENATE AMD C LCO 7523 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 155 PASS SENATE AMD D LCO 7525 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 156 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-19SenatePublic Act 19-89
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-17SenateHouse Calendar Number 611
2019-05-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-15SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-15SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 7525
2019-05-15SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 7523
2019-05-15SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7763
2019-05-15SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8232
2019-04-18SenateFile Number 758
2019-04-18SenateSenate Calendar Number 371
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-18SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-02SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-03-19SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-03-01SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-20SenatePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-08SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00375&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00375-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00375-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00375-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00089-R00SB-00375-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00375-R00PH-CV72-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00375-R00PH-CV147-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00375-R00PH-CV194-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00156-R00SB00375-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00155-R00SB00375-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00154-R00SB00375-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00153-R00SB00375-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00362-R00SB00375-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback