CT SB00380 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Calendar Number 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Calendar Number 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require dispensation and coverage of a prescribed drug for an insured for the duration of any grievance or review filed or requested by such insured of an adverse determination or a final adverse determination.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage Of A Prescribed Drug During Adverse Determination Reviews And External Review Processes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 139 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Calendar Number 501 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 292 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 164 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |