CT SB00388 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Calendar Number 643
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Calendar Number 643
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To address the needs of the intersex community who have suffered from discrimination and inaccurate documentation of their sex by providing relief from such issues.
Title
An Act Concerning Intersex Persons.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Sen. Matthew Lesser [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. Peter Tercyak [D] |
Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Quentin Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 192 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 643 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9112 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 713 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 358 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |