CT SB00391 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand veteran access to public assistance programs by exempting federal Aid and Attendance pension benefits from income.
Title
An Act Expanding Access By Veterans To Public Assistance Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 259 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-06-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-208 | |
2012-05-09 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-09 | House Passed | |
2012-05-04 | House Calendar Number 508 | |
2012-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-05-02 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Passed | |
2012-04-24 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-24 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-18 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-11 | File Number 374 | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Calendar Number 275 | |
2012-04-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-04 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-22 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-09 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |