CT SB00391 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - File Number 286
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - File Number 286
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow insurers to post certain insurance policies and endorsements on such insurers' Internet web sites.
Title
An Act Concerning The Electronic Posting Of Certain Documents By Insurers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | File Number 286 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 210 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |