CT SB00391 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To recoup state costs relating to services provided to workers who earn a low wage.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recoupment Of State Costs Attributable To Low Wage Employers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 4551 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-13 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2016-03-31 | Senate | File Number 387 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 267 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |