CT SB00393 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-01 - House Calendar Number 689
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-01 - House Calendar Number 689
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Developmental Services to use up-to-date medical assessment policies and consult with families, providers and advocates for persons with intellectual disability in its level of need assessment.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Developmental Services' Level Of Need Assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 275 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 689 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10218 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | File Number 658 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 317 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |