CT SB00394 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To ensure quality health care for women.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Council On Protecting Women's Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 378 (Y: 142 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 345 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-14HousePublic Act 19-70
2019-06-05HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseHouse Passed
2019-06-05HouseHouse Calendar Number 728
2019-06-05HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-06-05HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 214
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 128
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-28SenatePublic Hearing 03/04
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-02-26SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-13SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback