CT SB00419 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on General Law
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on General Law
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the market manipulation of gasoline zone pricing based on a service station's geographic location.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Gasoline Zone Pricing.
Sponsors
House Transportation Committee | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] | Sen. Will Haskell [D] | Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D] |
Rep. Caroline Simmons [D] | Rep. John Frey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on General Law |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on General Law |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference General Law |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |